Global patent index - EP 1063933 A1

EP 1063933 A1 2001-01-03 - IMPROVED METHOD FOR USING AN ORTHOPAEDIC FIXATION DEVICE

Title (en)

IMPROVED METHOD FOR USING AN ORTHOPAEDIC FIXATION DEVICE

Title (de)

ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR EINE ORTHOPÄDISCHE FIXATIONSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE AMELIORE D'UTILISATION D'UN DISPOSITIF DE FIXATION ORTHOPEDIQUE

Publication

EP 1063933 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912586 A

Priority

  • US 9905738 W
  • US 4002298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2323938A1] This invention is an external fixator (11), for positioning a first element(15), or the like relative to a second element (17), or the like. The external fixator (11) includes a first base (19) for mounting to the first element(15); a second base (21) for mounting to the second element (17); a plurality of adjustable effective length struts (23, 29, 35, 41); connector structure(59) for rotatably attaching the first ends (25, 31) of a first pair of struts relative to one another, and relative to the first base; connector structure(61, 63) for rotatably attaching the first ends (37, 43, 49, 55) of a second, and third pair of struts relative to one another relative to the first base; connector structure for rotatably attaching the second ends of a first, second, and third pair of struts relative to one another relative to the second base which is a unique method of using the external fixator.

[origin: CA2323938A1] This invention is an external fixator (11), for positioning a first element (15), or the like relative to a second element (17), or the like. The external fixator (11) includes a first base (19) for mounting to the first element (15); a second base (21) for mounting to the second element (17); a plurality of adjustable effective length struts (23, 29, 35, 41); connector structure (59) for rotatably attaching the first ends (25, 31) of a first pair of struts relative to one another, and relative to the first base; connector structure (61, 63) for rotatably attaching the first ends (37, 43, 49, 55) of a second, and third pair of struts relative to one another relative to the first base; connector structure for rotatably attaching the second ends of a first, second, and third pair of struts relative to one another relative to the second base which is a unique method of using the external fixator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/60 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 3093099 A 19991011; AU 738590 B2 20010920; CA 2323938 A1 19990923; EP 1063933 A1 20010103; EP 1063933 A4 20021025; JP 2002506673 A 20020305

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030123

2003-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMITH & NEPHEW, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-12-11 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-12-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61B 17/60 A, 7A 61B 17/66 B

2002-10-25 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

2002-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE