Global Patent Index - EP 1063991 A1

EP 1063991 A1 2001-01-03 - STATIN-MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITOR COMBINATIONS

Title (en)

STATIN-MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITOR COMBINATIONS

Title (de)

STATIN-MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASE INHIBITOREN ALS KOMBINATIONTHERAPEUTICA

Title (fr)

ASSOCIATIONS STATINE-INHIBITEUR DE METALLOPROTEASE MATRICIELLE

Publication

EP 1063991 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98960279 A

Priority

  • US 9824681 W
  • US 7826598 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947138A1] The invention is a pharmaceutical composition comprising an MMP inhibitor and a statin, said composition being useful for treating vascular diseases.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 45/06 (2006.01); A61K 31/195 (2006.01); A61K 31/22 (2006.01); A61K 31/366 (2006.01); A61K 31/40 (2006.01); A61P 3/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/40 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. A61K 31/40 + A61K 31/18
  2. A61K 31/40 + A61K 2300/00

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947138A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947138 A1 19990923; AR 018113 A1 20011031; AU 1591699 A 19991011; BR 9815745 A 20001114; CA 2309588 A1 19990923; CO 5070670 A1 20010828; EP 1063991 A1 20010103; GT 199900039 A 20000906; HN 1999000029 A 19990929; JP 2002506818 A 20020305; MY 140504 A 20091231; NZ 505994 A 20031031; PA 8469001 A1 20020917; PE 03482000 A1 20000522; SV 1999000026 A 20000118; UY 25436 A1 20011025; ZA 9902106 B 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2007-11-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070601

2007-02-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC

2005-06-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY LLC

2001-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010813

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20001017;LT PAYMENT 20001017;LV PAYMENT 20001017;MK PAYMENT 20001017;RO PAYMENT 20001017;SI PAYMENT 20001017