Global Patent Index - EP 1064022 A1

EP 1064022 A1 2001-01-03 - HLA-BINDING PEPTIDES AND THEIR USES

Title (en)

HLA-BINDING PEPTIDES AND THEIR USES

Title (de)

HLA-BINDEPROTEINE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PEPTIDES DE LIAISON DE HLA ET LEURS APPLICATIONS

Publication

EP 1064022 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98910404 A

Priority

US 9805039 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945954A1] The present invention provides the means and methods for selecting immunogenic peptides and the immunogenic peptide compositions capable of specifically binding glycoproteins encoded by HLA allele and inducing T cell activation in T cells restricted by the allele. The peptides are useful to elicit an immune response against a desired antigen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 39/29; A61K 39/00; C07K 7/00; C07K 14/02; C07K 14/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 39/00 (2006.01); A61K 39/29 (2006.01); A61P 31/12 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/04 (2006.01); C07K 7/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/36 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12Q 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/36 (2013.01); C07K 2317/10 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945954 A1 19990916; AU 6465598 A 19990927; CA 2323632 A1 19990916; EP 1064022 A1 20010103; EP 1064022 A4 20040929; JP 2002507397 A 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080401

2007-09-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070820

2004-09-29 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/29 A

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 39/00 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 7/00 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/02 B

2004-07-07 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 14/82 B

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EPIMMUNE INC.

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE