Global Patent Index - EP 1064105 A1

EP 1064105 A1 2001-01-03 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLEANING WORKING PARTS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CLEANING WORKING PARTS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON WERKSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE NETTOYAGE DE PIECES DE TRAVAIL

Publication

EP 1064105 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909047 A

Priority

  • FR 9900639 W
  • FR 9803451 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776213A1] The cleaner has a basket (27) to carry the work articles fitting in a chamber (1) from which it is spaced inwardly to define a cleaning fluid passage (9). The bottom of the chamber defines an annular drain trough connected to an extractor for the used fluid.- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - Claims include method of cleaning

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/04; B08B 3/10; B08B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/04 (2006.01); B08B 3/10 (2006.01); B08B 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/045 (2013.01); B08B 3/10 (2013.01); B08B 7/0021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948624A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776213 A1 19990924; FR 2776213 B1 20000526; AT 231749 T 20030215; DE 69905140 D1 20030306; DE 69905140 T2 20031120; EP 1064105 A1 20010103; EP 1064105 B1 20030129; ES 2190645 T3 20030801; WO 9948624 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040320

2005-03-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-01-26 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-11-10 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: SEPAREX S.A.

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040330

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040320

2004-03-19 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-03-19 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190645 T3

2003-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-04-29 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030429

2003-04-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-28 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20030328

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-26 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030326

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030319

2003-03-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030319

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030314

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69905140 P 20030306

2003-03-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL SE

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2003-01-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030129

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IE IT LI LU MC NL SE