Global Patent Index - EP 1064108 A3

EP 1064108 A3 2002-09-11 - BENDING MACHINE

Title (en)

BENDING MACHINE

Title (de)

BIEGEMASCHINE

Title (fr)

CINTREUSE

Publication

EP 1064108 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00901523 A

Priority

  • DE 19901794 A
  • EP 0000126 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19901794A1] The machine has a bending tool (110) with bending nose (242) having a curved pressure surface (246) to charge one side (116) of the flat material (46). The tool is moved by a drive between start-up and end positions along a track (260) and about a bending edge (104,106). The edge is defined, so that the pressure surface and the material surface move relative to each other in a slide-free roll-off process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19901794 A1 20000727; AT 291973 T 20050415; CA 2324366 A1 20000727; EP 1064108 A2 20010103; EP 1064108 A3 20020911; EP 1064108 B1 20050330; ES 2238266 T3 20050901; JP 2002535146 A 20021022; PT 1064108 E 20050729; US 6324882 B1 20011204; WO 0043142 A2 20000727; WO 0043142 A3 20010329; WO 0043142 A8 20010531

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20050330

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES

- Effective date: 20050330

2010-08-24 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2010-07-20 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20100715

2010-07-14 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-07-14 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20090909

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090112

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090130

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20090109

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090129

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081216

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20081208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20081118

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2006-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SALVAGNINI ITALIA S.P.A.

2006-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: TRUMPF WERKZEUGMASCHINEN GMBH + CO. KG

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-02-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SALVAGNINI ITALIA S.P.A.

- Effective date: 20051228

2006-02-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: TRUMPF WERKZEUGMASCHINEN GMBH + CO. KG

- Effective date: 20051223

2006-01-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2006-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060131

2005-11-30 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238266 T3

2005-07-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Effective date: 20050519

2005-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-27 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2005-06-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-06-14 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-05-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009896 P 20050504

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2005-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-03-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-03-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-03-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050330

2005-03-30 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2004-11-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: RAS REINHARDT MASCHINENBAU GMBH

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031009

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE