Global Patent Index - EP 1064115 A1

EP 1064115 A1 2001-01-03 - CLOSURE PLATE AND A SLIDE GATE ON THE OUTLET OF A CONTAINER CONTAINING MOLTEN METAL

Title (en)

CLOSURE PLATE AND A SLIDE GATE ON THE OUTLET OF A CONTAINER CONTAINING MOLTEN METAL

Title (de)

VERSCHLUSSPLATTE SOWIE EIN SCHIEBEVERSCHLUSS AM AUSGUSS EINES METALLSCHMELZE ENTHALTENDEN BEHÄLTERS

Title (fr)

PLAQUE D'OBTURATION AINSI QUE BUSETTE A TIROIR SUR LA BUSETTE DE COULEE D'UN RECIPIENT CONTENANT DU METAL EN FUSION

Publication

EP 1064115 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907222 A

Priority

  • CH 9900119 W
  • CH 63498 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947296A1] The invention relates to a closure plate (20) for a slide gate (10) comprising a fire-resistant plate (22) and a metal jacket (33) which surrounds said fire-resistant plate. A centering means is assigned to the closure plate (20). Said centering means is formed by preferably two stopping surfaces (23, 24) which are arranged at a certain distance from one another. Each stopping surface almost at least partially rises up vertically in relation to the plate support (26) formed by the metal jacket (21) and comprises a thickness which is approximately equal to the thickness (21') of the metal jacket. These stopping surfaces (23, 24) are arranged in such a way that they lie on correspondingly configured stopping surfaces (18', 19') situated on the metal frame (14, 15) when the plate (20) is in an inserted and centered state. This plate (20) can be manufactured in an easy and economical manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 41/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/10 (2006.01); B22D 41/28 (2006.01); B22D 41/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 41/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947296A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947296 A1 19990923; AT 242071 T 20030615; AU 2709499 A 19991011; AU 754954 B2 20021128; BR 9908676 A 20001205; CA 2323902 A1 19990923; CA 2323902 C 20091110; CN 1127387 C 20031112; CN 1298330 A 20010606; DE 59905840 D1 20030710; EP 1064115 A1 20010103; EP 1064115 B1 20030604; ES 2203075 T3 20040401; JP 2002506734 A 20020305; JP 4446598 B2 20100407; MY 129237 A 20070330; RU 2216431 C2 20031120; TR 200002655 T2 20010122; TW 542758 B 20030721; US 6415967 B1 20020709; ZA 9902114 B 19990928

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170313

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170329

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS AND PARTNER AG PATENTANWAELTE, CH

2014-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: WILLI LUCHS, CH

2012-07-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59905840

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE HENKEL, BREUER & PARTNER, DE

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2203075 T3

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031018

2003-10-15 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403553

2003-09-23 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905840 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: STOPINC AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011008

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001003

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE