Global Patent Index - EP 1064120 A1

EP 1064120 A1 2001-01-03 - METHOD FOR MACHINING PLANE SURFACES OF A DISK BRAKE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MACHINING PLANE SURFACES OF A DISK BRAKE FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR BEARBEITUNG PLANER FLÄCHEN EINER SCHEIBENBREMSE FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR L'USINAGE DE SURFACES PLANES D'UN FREIN A DISQUE POUR DES VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES

Publication

EP 1064120 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00906212 A

Priority

  • EP 0000394 W
  • US 23359599 A
  • US 30487599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0043161A1] The invention relates to a method for machining plane surfaces of a disk brake (1) for motor vehicles. According to the invention, a wheel bearing unit consisting of a wheel hub (2), a roller arrangement (3) and an external bearing ring (4) is fixed on a workpiece support (6) with the vehicle side mounting surface (5) of the bearing ring (4) and the wheel hub (2) of the wheel bearing unit is driven in rotation. A flange surface (1) which is provided on the wheel hub (2) for a brake disk or the braking surfaces of a disk brake which is mounted on the flange surface is/are machined.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 7/17; B24B 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23Q 17/20 (2006.01); B24B 7/17 (2006.01); B24B 41/06 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/17 (2013.01); B24B 41/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0043161A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0043161 A1 20000727; DE 50000612 D1 20021114; EP 1064120 A1 20010103; EP 1064120 B1 20021009; EP 1064120 B2 20060920; JP 2002535152 A 20021022; US 6139405 A 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080119

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080131

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080119

2008-12-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081029

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080801

2008-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080119

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070111

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070622

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-04-13 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2007-01-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070125

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-01-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030120

2006-10-11 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2006-09-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060920

2006-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: EMAG MASCHINENFABRIK GMBHEUROPEAN PATENT ATTORNEY

- Effective date: 20030709

2003-06-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1064120E

2003-04-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-11-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50000612 20021114

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-10-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-10-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-04-13 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-04-04 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000729

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE