Global Patent Index - EP 1064131 A1

EP 1064131 A1 2001-01-03 - CONCRETE COMPACTING DEVICE WITH VIBRATION SENSOR AND CONTROL UNIT

Title (en)

CONCRETE COMPACTING DEVICE WITH VIBRATION SENSOR AND CONTROL UNIT

Title (de)

BETONVERDICHTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT SCHWINGUNGSSENSOR UND STEUERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMPRESSION DU BETON AVEC CAPTEUR DE VIBRATIONS ET UNITE DE COMMANDE

Publication

EP 1064131 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915614 A

Priority

  • DE 19811344 A
  • EP 9901692 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811344A1] The invention relates to a concrete compacting device for compacting plastically deformable concrete in a formwork (2), comprising at least one vibrating unit (1) which is attached to the formwork (2) and has a vibration-generating unit (3). The compacting device is characterized in that the vibrating unit (1) comprises an acceleration sensor (5) for generating a signal corresponding to a vibration generated by the vibration-generating unit (3) at the level of the formwork (2), and a control unit (6) which is impinged upon by said signal and serves to control operating parameters of the vibration-generating unit (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 1/087; B06B 1/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/08 (2006.01); B28B 1/087 (2006.01); B28B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 1/0873 (2013.01); B28B 17/0081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947322A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811344 A1 19991007; DE 19811344 C2 20020627; EP 1064131 A1 20010103; EP 1064131 B1 20040128; ES 2213362 T3 20040816; JP 2002506748 A 20020305; US 6544025 B1 20030408; WO 9947322 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130316

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150710

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-15 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908423

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908423

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130315

2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20131129

2013-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130316

2013-10-29 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2013-06-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120326

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-05-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: WACKER NEUSON SE, 80809 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59908423

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-05-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908423

- Representative's name: MUELLER HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20120326

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120403

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-03-26 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59908423

- Representative's name: MUELLER - HOFFMANN & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2012-02-20 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO.KG

- Effective date: 20120208

2012-01-06 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: WACKER NEUSON PRODUKTION GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Effective date: 20111205

2009-12-04 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2009-12-04 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2005-01-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-09-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2213362 T3

2004-07-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-05-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908423 P 20040304

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2004-01-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040128

2004-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: STEFFEN, MICHAEL

2004-01-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GLANZ, CHRISTIAN

2002-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WACKER CONSTRUCTION EQUIPMENT AG

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000728

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE