Global Patent Index - EP 1064147 A1

EP 1064147 A1 2001-01-03 - DEVICE FOR FEEDING PAPER WEBS USED BY A MACHINE PRODUCING A PADDING-LIKE PACKAGING MATERIAL, AND MACHINE WITH SUCH A DEVICE

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR FEEDING PAPER WEBS USED BY A MACHINE PRODUCING A PADDING-LIKE PACKAGING MATERIAL, AND MACHINE WITH SUCH A DEVICE

Title (de)

ANORDNUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON PAPIERBAHNEN FÜR EINE MASCHINE ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLSTERARTIGEM VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL UND MASCHINE MIT EINER DERARTIGEN ANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR AMENER DES BANDES DE PAPIER DESTINEES A UNE MACHINE SERVANT A LA PRODUCTION D'UN MATERIAU D'EMBALLAGE DU TYPE REMBOURRAGE, ET MACHINE POURVUE D'UN TEL DISPOSITIF

Publication

EP 1064147 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99930977 A

Priority

  • CH 9900343 W
  • CH 163298 A
  • CH 233398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0007808A1] The inventive device comprises a shaft (11) over which are mounted a supply reel (12) with a paper web (8) comprising a plurality of paper layers, a deflector reel (13) acting upon said paper web and a separation device (14) used for separating the paper layers. Said deflector reel (13) is mounted in such a way that it can move relative to the path followed by the paper web, in order to tense paper webs drawn from said supply reel (12). The separation device (14) comprises at least one first guiding means (17), which is mounted in such a way that it can move relatively to the path followed by the paper web, and a second guiding means (18), which is mounted in such a way that it can move relatively to the path followed by a paper layer, whereby paper layers drawn from the deflector reel (13) can be tensed. The inventive device advantageously guarantees an appropriate feeding of paper, at high speed, whereby production performance of said device is improved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31D 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31D 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31D 5/0047 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0023 (2013.01); B31D 2205/0047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0007808A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0007808 A1 20000217; AT 295777 T 20050615; AU 4766799 A 20000228; DE 59912074 D1 20050623; EP 1064147 A1 20010103; EP 1064147 B1 20050518; ES 2241293 T3 20051016

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120724

2013-10-21 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131021

2013-05-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59912074

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120723

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130329

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120723

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100724

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110725

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110726

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110805

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-04-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100731

2011-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2011-02-16 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20110201

2010-07-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090723

2010-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-03-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2010-01-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *KELLER REINHARD

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-11-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090728

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090729

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080702

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080729

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-05-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060221

2006-03-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-12-29 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-10-24 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051024

2005-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2241293

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-09-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-08-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2005-07-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050723

2005-07-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050723

2005-07-18 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-06-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59912074

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-06-23

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2005-06-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-05-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-05-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-05-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050518

2005-05-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050518

2003-06-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030422

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001005

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE