Global Patent Index - EP 1064190 A1

EP 1064190 A1 2001-01-03 - LOCKING DEVICE FOR A HELMET

Title (en)

LOCKING DEVICE FOR A HELMET

Title (de)

SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN HELM

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE D'UN CASQUE

Publication

EP 1064190 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914849 A

Priority

  • SE 9900448 W
  • SE 9801061 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950132A1] A device for locking a bicycle helmet to a bicycle, said helmet comprising a helmet shell (19) having a through-going hole (20). A lock case (4) is fixedly mounted on a frame rod (2), said frame rod being arranged to support the saddle (1) of the bicycle. A longitudinal locking element (11) at both ends has a lock head (10), said lock head (10) may be locked in the lock case. The locking element (11) is arranged to extend through the hole (20) of the helmet shell in order to have its lock head (10) locked in the lock case (4) and thus securing the helmet to the bicycle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B62J 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B62J 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B62J 11/005 (2013.01); Y10T 70/454 (2015.04); Y10T 70/491 (2015.04); Y10T 70/5013 (2015.04); Y10T 70/5027 (2015.04); Y10T 70/5872 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950132A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950132 A1 19991007; AU 3350199 A 19991018; DE 69927961 D1 20051201; EP 1064190 A1 20010103; EP 1064190 B1 20051026; SE 511976 C2 20000110; SE 9801061 D0 19980327; SE 9801061 L 19990928; US 6415635 B1 20020709

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090323

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090323

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060727

2006-04-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2006-01-27 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060127

2005-12-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927961 P 20051201

2005-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2005-10-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-10-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-10-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PERSSON, AKE

2005-03-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JONASSON, LARS

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000920

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL