Global Patent Index - EP 1064205 A1

EP 1064205 A1 2001-01-03 - AIRLESS DISPENSING DEVICE

Title (en)

AIRLESS DISPENSING DEVICE

Title (de)

AIRLESS-ABGABEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE DISTRIBUTION AIRLESS

Publication

EP 1064205 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909051 A

Priority

  • FR 9900645 W
  • FR 9803734 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776633A1] The invention concerns a dispensing device without air circulation, such as an airless pump, for dispensing a fluid, said device comprising a dispensing chamber (14) with variable volume including an intake (12) provided with an intake check valve (51; 53) and an outlet provided with an outlet check valve, said dispenser further comprising a piston (3) for varying the dispensing chamber (14) volume, sealing means (51; 52; 55; 63) being provided to seal the dispensing chamber (14) substantially at its intake (12) before the first use thereof, characterised in that the sealing means are formed by the intake check valve (51, 53).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 47/34; B05B 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/00 (2006.01); B65D 47/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 11/3025 (2013.01); B05B 11/0005 (2013.01); B05B 11/0008 (2013.01); B05B 11/3023 (2013.01); B05B 11/3047 (2013.01); B05B 11/3067 (2013.01); B05B 11/0097 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948766A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776633 A1 19991001; FR 2776633 B1 20000609; DE 69901890 D1 20020725; DE 69901890 T2 20030220; EP 1064205 A1 20010103; EP 1064205 B1 20020619; ES 2178877 T3 20030101; US 6332561 B1 20011225; WO 9948766 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-02-08 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: APTAR FRANCE SAS, FR

- Effective date: 20130104

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100320

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110404

2011-04-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110419

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100319

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100319

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100319

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090303

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030320

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2178877 T3

2002-10-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020919

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901890 20020725

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011128

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT