Global Patent Index - EP 1064206 A1

EP 1064206 A1 2001-01-03 - WRAP-AROUND ARTICLE CARRIER

Title (en)

WRAP-AROUND ARTICLE CARRIER

Title (de)

UMHÜLLENDER VERPACKUNGSTRÄGER

Title (fr)

PORTE-ARTICLES A FORME ENVELOPPANTE

Publication

EP 1064206 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914921 A

Priority

  • GB 9805467 A
  • US 9905761 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0037331A1] An article carrier and blank for forming an article carrier for containing a plurality of necked articles (A) comprising a top, bottom and opposed side panels (24, 14, 32, 18, 26) interconnected together, wherein the top panel (24) comprises article receiving and retaining means (12) including an article retaining flap (56, 58) formed from the top panel (24), which article retaining flap (56, 58) is being adapted to be folded inwardly of the top panel (24) thereby to define an aperture (54) for receiving a neck portion of the article (A) and wherein the article retaining flap (56, 58) abuts said neck portion to engage and retain said article (A)

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/04 (2006.01); B65D 71/00 (2006.01); B65D 71/12 (2006.01); B65D 71/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/18 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00172 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00265 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00444 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00716 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0037331A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0037331 A1 20000629; AT 224846 T 20021015; AU 3355999 A 20000712; BR 9908770 A 20001114; CA 2321698 A1 20000629; CA 2321698 C 20050705; CN 1163387 C 20040825; CN 1293638 A 20010502; CZ 20002973 A3 20011212; DE 69903140 D1 20021031; DE 69903140 T2 20030522; DK 1064206 T3 20030120; EP 1064206 A1 20010103; EP 1064206 B1 20020925; ES 2185332 T3 20030416; GB 9805467 D0 19980513; HK 1033823 A1 20030307; HU 0101184 A2 20010828; HU 0101184 A3 20021028; JP 2003529496 A 20031007; PL 194913 B1 20070731; PL 342966 A1 20010716; PT 1064206 E 20030228; TR 200002509 T2 20010420

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070316

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2008-07-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060316

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLCONE HIGH RIDGE

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060703

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060317

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-12-13 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2006-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-11-30 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-11-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-30 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061001

2006-09-18 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060918

2006-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060317

2006-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060317

2006-03-16 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-16 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060316

2006-03-16 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060316

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, INC (A DELAWARE CORPORATION)

2005-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2005-04-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

2005-03-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC

- Free text: THE MEAD CORPORATION#COURTHOUSE PLAZA NE#DAYTON OHIO 45463 (US) -TRANSFER TO- MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC#ONE HIGH RIDGE PARK#STAMFORD, CT 06905 (US)

2005-03-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-11 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-04 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050304

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-28 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20050228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20050224

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-23 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20050223

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-22 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050222

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-17 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050217

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-14 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20050214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050214

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-11 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-11 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050211

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-08 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2003-09-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030626

2003-04-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-04-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2185332 T3

2003-02-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20021212

2003-01-20 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-12-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20020403668

2002-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69903140 20021031

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KIRKER & CIE SA

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224846 T 20021015

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010118

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001016

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE