Global Patent Index - EP 1064214 A1

EP 1064214 A1 2001-01-03 - FORMER

Title (en)

FORMER

Title (de)

FALZTRICHTER

Title (fr)

CONE PLIEUR

Publication

EP 1064214 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920545 A

Priority

  • DE 9900699 W
  • DE 19811109 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811109A1] At least inside the area (14,15,20) of the top former surface (8,10), there is a number of superimposed and adjacent lower (23-26,44) and upper (44,46-49) conveyors. The conveyors are brought into and out of contact with each other. The conveyors are aligned in the direction of production. On each side of the side barriers of the former surface, as far as or near a former roller (18,19) are guide side parts (21,22).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 45/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/223 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947446A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811109 A1 19990916; EP 1062176 A1 20001227; EP 1062176 B1 20020515; EP 1064214 A1 20010103; EP 1064214 B1 20020502; JP 2002506785 A 20020305; JP 3472263 B2 20031202; US 6497643 B1 20021224; US 6544160 B1 20030408; WO 9947445 A1 19990923; WO 9947445 B1 19991028; WO 9947446 A1 19990923; WO 9947446 B1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080313

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070503

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070501

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060317

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030204

2002-10-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-06-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901351

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-06

2002-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001007

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI