Global Patent Index - EP 1064339 A1

EP 1064339 A1 2001-01-03 - COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES FOR OIL FIELD APPLICATIONS

Title (en)

COMPOSITIONS AND PROCESSES FOR OIL FIELD APPLICATIONS

Title (de)

ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR ANWENDUNGEN AUF ÖLFELDERN

Title (fr)

COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES POUR APPLICATIONS RELATIVES AUX CHAMPS DE PETROLE

Publication

EP 1064339 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98911699 A

Priority

US 9805153 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947624A1] A composition and a process for treating a subterranean formation are disclosed. The process comprises injecting into the subterranean formation a composition which comprises a polymer, a crosslinking agent, a liquid, optionally a clay, and further optionally a weighting agent wherein the polymer forms a gel in the formation, in the presence of the crosslinking agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C09K 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C09K 8/20 (2006.01); C09K 8/24 (2006.01); C09K 8/512 (2006.01); C09K 8/514 (2006.01); C09K 8/575 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C09K 8/512 (2013.01); C09K 8/206 (2013.01); C09K 8/24 (2013.01); C09K 8/514 (2013.01); C09K 8/5756 (2013.01); C09K 8/5758 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FI GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947624 A1 19990923; EP 1064339 A1 20010103; EP 1064339 A4 20070926; NO 20004553 A 20001117; NO 20004553 D0 20000912

INPADOC legal status


2010-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100622

2008-06-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080515

2007-09-26 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070821

2003-06-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CONOCOPHILLIPS COMPANY

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FI GB