Global Patent Index - EP 1064343 A1

EP 1064343 A1 2001-01-03 - INTEGRATED HYDROCONVERSION PROCESS WITH REVERSE HYDROGEN FLOW

Title (en)

INTEGRATED HYDROCONVERSION PROCESS WITH REVERSE HYDROGEN FLOW

Title (de)

INTEGRIERTES WASSERSTOFFUMWANDLUNGSVERFAHREN MIT WASSERSTOFF-ZURÜCKFÜHRUNG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE INTEGRE D'HYDROCONVERSION A FLUX D'HYDROGENE INVERSE

Publication

EP 1064343 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99902134 A

Priority

  • US 9900478 W
  • US 7801998 P
  • US 7801198 P
  • US 7801298 P
  • US 8335998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947626A1] An integrated process for hydrocracking and for hydrotreating dissimilar feeds using a single hydrogen recovery and recycle loop is disclosed. In the integrated process, hydrogen recovered from a first reaction zone is recovered and passed, without substantial cooling, to a second reaction zone. Liquid products from the first reaction zone may optionally be passed, along with the recovered hydrogen, to the second reaction zone. Hydrogen recovered from the second reaction zone is purified and used as a source of hydrogen for a first reaction zone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10G 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10G 65/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10G 65/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947626A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947626 A1 19990923; WO 9947626 A9 19991118; AR 014713 A1 20010328; AU 2218299 A 19991011; AU 761961 B2 20030612; BR 9908753 A 20001226; BR 9908753 B1 20100713; CA 2323910 A1 19990923; DE 69915599 D1 20040422; DE 69915599 T2 20040805; DK 1064343 T3 20040621; EA 200000945 A1 20010423; EP 1064343 A1 20010103; EP 1064343 B1 20040317; ES 2218987 T3 20041116; HU 0101799 A2 20011028; HU 0101799 A3 20020328; JP 2002506919 A 20020305; JP 4383659 B2 20091216; PL 189544 B1 20050831; PL 342895 A1 20010716; PT 1064343 E 20040730

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160127

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20100108

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100125

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100115

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-21 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20100219

2008-06-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050108

2005-10-10 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2005-08-31 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050108

2005-08-30 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-08-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-08-02 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050802

2005-02-16 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SHELL INTERNATIONALE RESEARCH MAATSCHAPPIJ B.V.

- Effective date: 20041217

2005-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050109

2005-01-08 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050108

2004-11-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218987 T3

2004-07-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040602

2004-07-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040401983

2004-07-06 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-06-21 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69915599 P 20040422

2004-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI PT SE

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHEVRON U.S.A. INC.

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010125

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001011

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI PT SE