Global Patent Index - EP 1064349 A2

EP 1064349 A2 2001-01-03 - AQUEOUS MULTIPHASE DETERGENTS

Title (en)

AQUEOUS MULTIPHASE DETERGENTS

Title (de)

WÄSSRIGES MEHRPHASIGES REINIGUNGSMITTEL

Title (fr)

DETERGENT LIQUIDE POLYPHASE

Publication

EP 1064349 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99911758 A

Priority

  • DE 19811386 A
  • DE 19859774 A
  • EP 9901507 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1126019A1] Aqueous liquid multiphase detergent containing surfactant has at least 2 continuous phases, including a lower aqueous phase (I) and an immiscible upper aqueous phase (II), which can be converted to an emulsion temporarily by shaking. The novelty is that the detergent contains 0-5 wt.% sodium hexametaphosphate. An independent claim is also included for the production of the detergent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 1/83; C11D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/08 (2006.01); C11D 1/22 (2006.01); C11D 1/62 (2006.01); C11D 1/66 (2006.01); C11D 1/72 (2006.01); C11D 1/83 (2006.01); C11D 1/86 (2006.01); C11D 3/06 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0017 (2013.01); C11D 3/06 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 1/22 (2013.01); C11D 1/662 (2013.01); C11D 1/72 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947635A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1126019 A1 20010822; EP 1126019 B1 20030604; AT 240387 T 20030515; AT 242313 T 20030615; CA 2324075 A1 19990923; EP 1064349 A2 20010103; EP 1064349 B1 20030514; ES 2200511 T3 20040301; ES 2200994 T3 20040316; JP 2002506925 A 20020305; US 6440924 B1 20020827; WO 9947635 A2 19990923; WO 9947635 A3 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2012-05-09 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20120509

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2012-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905562

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110309

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HENKEL K.G.A.A.

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100322

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100318

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100304

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-07-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20100408

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20100312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100303

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100316

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200511 T3

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905562 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010412

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL