Global patent index - EP 1064379 A2

EP 1064379 A2 2001-01-03 - HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES FROM TISSUE OF BREAST TUMORS

Title (en)

HUMAN NUCLEIC ACID SEQUENCES FROM TISSUE OF BREAST TUMORS

Title (de)

MENSCHLICHE NUKLEINSÄURESEQUENZEN AUS BRUSTTUMORGEWEBE

Title (fr)

SEQUENCES D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE HUMAIN TIREES DE TISSUS DE TUMEURS DU SEIN

Publication

EP 1064379 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99924683 A

Priority

  • DE 9900908 W
  • DE 19813839 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813839A1] Human nucleic acid sequences from tumor breast tissue are new. A nucleic acid sequence that encodes (part of) a gene product comprises: (a) a nucleic acid sequence (I), chosen from a group of 32 sequences (fully defined in the specification); (b) an allelic variant (II) of (I); or (c) a nucleic acid sequence (III), that is complementary to (I) or (II). Independent claims are also included for: (1) a nucleic acid sequence (68 sequences fully defined in the specification), characterized in that it has increased expression in tumor breast tissue; (2) BAC, PAC and cosmid clones, containing functional genes and their chromosomal localization, corresponding to one of 76 sequences for use as vehicles for gene transfer; (3) a nucleic acid sequence comprising part of a sequence as above which is sufficiently large to hybridize to a sequence as above; (4) an expression cassette comprising a nucleic acid fragment or a sequence as above, together with at least a control or regulatory sequence; (5) a DNA fragment, comprising a gene, that is produced as a result of using a nucleic acid sequence as above; (6) a host cell containing genetic information for expression of a heterologous nucleic acid sequence as above; (7) a process for manufacturing a polypeptide or fragments, characterized in that the host cell above is cultivated; (8) an antibody against a polypeptide, which is encoded by a nucleic acid as above; (9) a polypeptide partial sequence having one of 60 sequences (fully defined in the specification); and (10) a genomic gene, its promoter, enhancer, silencer, exon and intron structure and splice variants, generated from cDNA having one of the 68 sequences.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12N 15/12; A61K 38/17; C07K 14/47; C07K 16/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/09 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947669A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813839 A1 19990923; EP 1064379 A2 20010103; EP 1236799 A2 20020904; EP 1236799 A3 20030502; JP 2002506643 A 20020305; WO 9947669 A2 19990923; WO 9947669 A3 20000615

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20071002

2005-03-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050131

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HINZMANN, BERND, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE, PROF.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPECHT, THOMAS, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PILARSKY, CHRISTIAN, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DAHL, EDGAR, DR.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-02-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: METAGEN PHARMACEUTICALS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE