Global Patent Index - EP 1064399 A2

EP 1064399 A2 2001-01-03 - METHODS, KITS AND COMPOSITIONS PERTAINING TO DETECTION COMPLEXES

Title (en)

METHODS, KITS AND COMPOSITIONS PERTAINING TO DETECTION COMPLEXES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN, REAGENTIENSÄTZE UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR ERKENNUNGSKOMPLEXE

Title (fr)

PROCEDES, KITS ET COMPOSITIONS SE RAPPORTANT A DES COMPLEXES DE DETECTION

Publication

EP 1064399 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99911496 A

Priority

  • US 9906422 W
  • US 7921198 P

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C12Q 1/68; C07K 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12Q 1/68 (2006.01); G01N 33/53 (2006.01); C07K 14/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949293A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 3012599 A 19991018; EP 1064399 A2 20010103; JP 2002507434 A 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C12Q 1/68 20060101AFI20140122BHEP

2014-02-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: C07K 14/00 20060101ALI20140122BHEP

2007-01-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060804

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COULL, JAMES, M.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GILDEA, BRIAN, D.

2006-09-06 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HYLDIG-NIELSEN, JENS, J.

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: COULL, JAMES, M.

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GILDEA, BRIAN, D.

2001-10-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HYLDIG-NIELSEN, JENS, J.

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001020

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE