Global Patent Index - EP 1064419 A1

EP 1064419 A1 2001-01-03 - IMPROVED TEMPORARY SURFACE COVERING

Title (en)

IMPROVED TEMPORARY SURFACE COVERING

Title (de)

BEHILFSMÄSSIGER BODENBELAG

Title (fr)

REVETEMENT DE SURFACE PROVISOIRE PERFECTIONNE

Publication

EP 1064419 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909053 A

Priority

  • FR 9900647 W
  • FR 9803703 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776308A1] The material to provide a temporary surface on sand and similar ground, for the movement of wheeled traffic, is a woven fabric (1) with a second and auxiliary woven fabric (2) which are overlaid. The material to provide a temporary surface on sand and similar ground, for the movement of wheeled traffic, is a woven fabric (1) with a second and auxiliary woven fabric (2) which are overlaid. The second material is a layer of woven warps and wefts, locked together with the first fabric (1) while they are both being woven together on the loom. The interlock between the layers is structured to form tubular pockets (3), aligned on the warps or the wefts. The pockets (3) take supporting rods (4) of different types for various applications. The pockets (3) are designed to take at least one stiffening rod (4), of a composite material, or an inflatable tube such as through water under pressure. The pockets can also contain mine detectors for their removal and/or systems to explode and destroy the sand track.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 11/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G12B 9/04 (2006.01); B60J 11/00 (2006.01); D03D 11/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 11/02 (2013.01); Y10T 428/1362 (2013.01); Y10T 428/18 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24355 (2013.01); Y10T 442/3472 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949116A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776308 A1 19990924; FR 2776308 B1 20000623; AT 241714 T 20030615; AU 2843799 A 19991018; AU 757292 B2 20030213; CA 2323713 A1 19990930; CA 2323713 C 20080617; CN 1113993 C 20030709; CN 1298462 A 20010606; DE 69908324 D1 20030703; DE 69908324 T2 20040429; DK 1064419 T3 20030915; EP 1064419 A1 20010103; EP 1064419 B1 20030528; ES 2200503 T3 20040301; HK 1038045 A1 20040402; ID 27302 A 20010322; IL 138556 D0 20011031; JP 2002507522 A 20020312; JP 4781531 B2 20110928; NO 20004684 A 20001117; NO 20004684 D0 20000919; NZ 507071 A 20030328; PT 1064419 E 20031031; TR 200003599 T2 20010420; US 6696122 B1 20040224; WO 9949116 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160302

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160304

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160325

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-05-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040302

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2200503

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-11-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031015

2003-09-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

- Ref Document Number: 20030403270

- Country of Ref Document: GR

2003-09-16 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-09-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-08-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: MOINAS & SAVOYE SA

2003-07-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69908324

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: FRENCH

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-05-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2003-05-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001006

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE