Global Patent Index - EP 1064422 A1

EP 1064422 A1 2001-01-03 - STEAM IRON

Title (en)

STEAM IRON

Title (de)

DAMPFBÜGELEISEN

Title (fr)

FER A REPASSER A VAPEUR

Publication

EP 1064422 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99915794 A

Priority

  • FR 9900672 W
  • FR 9803849 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776680A1] The invention concerns an iron comprising a water reservoir (17) communicating with an evaporating chamber (12) through an outlet gasket (23) sink (25), and a device (35) regulating the water flow comprising a vertical sliding gate (39) provided at its lower end with a bulge (46), controlled by a button (43) and axially mobile between a dry position wherein it closes the sink (25) and a steam position wherein it allows water through the sink (25). The invention is characterised in that the sliding gate (39) bulge (46) is mounted tight in the gasket sink (25) and is urged at regular intervals to bridge a vertical slot (52) provided on part of the sink (25) height and defining with the sliding gate bulge (46) a section for water to pass through when the sliding gate (39) is in steam position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950496A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776680 A1 19991001; FR 2776680 B1 20010928; CN 1302344 A 20010704; DE 69904029 D1 20030102; DE 69904029 T2 20031009; EP 1064422 A1 20010103; EP 1064422 B1 20021120; ES 2188154 T3 20030616; US 6318009 B1 20011120; WO 9950496 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20060323

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050326

2006-03-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060323

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-26 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-03-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-01-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20050120

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-05-04 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040504

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-02 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040302

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *MOULINEX

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2188154 T3

2003-05-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-04-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030315

2003-04-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: SEB S.A.

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-02-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030220

2003-01-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SEB S.A.

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904029 20030102

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL PT

2002-11-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021120

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020201

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001027

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES GB IT LI NL PT