Global Patent Index - EP 1064432 A1

EP 1064432 A1 2001-01-03 - CONSOLIDATION METHOD FOR SOIL LAYERS WITH LOW PERMEABILITY

Title (en)

CONSOLIDATION METHOD FOR SOIL LAYERS WITH LOW PERMEABILITY

Title (de)

KONSOLIDIERUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR BODENSCHICHT MIT NIEDRIGER DURCHLÄSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE CONSOLIDATION DE COUCHES DE TERRAIN A FAIBLE PERMEABILITE

Publication

EP 1064432 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910865 A

Priority

  • NL 9900141 W
  • NL 1008617 A
  • NL 1009792 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947756A1] In order to consolidate a water-containing layer of soil with limited liquid permeability, for example a clay- or peat-containing layer, at least one dewatering element is placed in the soil, which dewatering element comprises a trench or hole (1) which is filled with a material with good water permeability, such as sand, and in which trench or hole there is a pipe (3) which has an impermeable wall and is connected to a filter element. By means of a separate riser pipe (8; 8, 30), ground-water which has entered the pipe (3) via the filter (4) is raised to above ground level, this riser line (8; 8, 30) being situated at least partially in the said pipe (3). A non-return valve (6) is connected to the filter (4) on the pipe (3), and the said riser line (8; 8, 30) comprises a suction line which is connected to a suction source (10, 11) positioned above or in the vicinity of ground level.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E02D 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E02D 3/106 (2013.01); E02D 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947756A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947756 A1 19990923; AU 2963099 A 19991011; DE 69902088 D1 20020814; DE 69902088 T2 20030320; EP 1064432 A1 20010103; EP 1064432 B1 20020710; NL 1009792 C1 19990920

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080316

2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080316

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HOLLANDSCHE *BETON GROEP N.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070425

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-24 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070427

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070330

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-07-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030411

2002-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69902088

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-08-14

2002-07-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

2002-07-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000915

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL