Global Patent Index - EP 1064442 A1

EP 1064442 A1 2001-01-03 - TRANSPORTABLE PODIUM

Title (en)

TRANSPORTABLE PODIUM

Title (de)

TRANSPORTABLE TRIBÜNE

Title (fr)

TRIBUNE TRANSPORTABLE

Publication

EP 1064442 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910352 A

Priority

  • DE 19811766 A
  • EP 9901745 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19811766C1] The invention relates to a transportable podium (1) with step elements (2) which in an operating position of the podium (1) have different heights above a floor (6). To facilitate the assembly and disassembly of a mobile podium (1) the invention provides for the step elements (2) to be configured such that they can be extended telescopically and to be arranged in a substantially cuboidal support frame (5).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 3/123 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9947769A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19811766 C1 19991007; AT 241072 T 20030615; AU 2933799 A 19991011; AU 748602 B2 20020606; CA 2324073 A1 19990923; CA 2324073 C 20070626; CZ 20003272 A3 20010314; CZ 299972 B6 20090107; DK 1064442 T3 20030922; EP 1064442 A1 20010103; EP 1064442 B1 20030521; ES 2196786 T3 20031216; HU 0102917 A2 20011228; HU 0102917 A3 20040301; HU 224114 B1 20050530; PL 195936 B1 20071130; PL 342903 A1 20010716; PT 1064442 E 20030930; TR 200003760 T2 20010723; WO 9947769 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2014-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121002

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120318

2013-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130710

2013-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120317

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120317

2013-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120402

2013-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120331

2013-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120317

2013-01-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59905645

- Effective date: 20121002

2012-12-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 241072 T

- Effective date: 20120317

2012-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120317

2012-11-05 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2012-10-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120318

2012-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120317

2012-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-10-30 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111004

2012-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110919

2011-10-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111001

2011-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CONTRIBSYSTEMS VERTRIEBS G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-09-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110526

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110329

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-09-28 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20110919

2011-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110324

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110325

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110323

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110401

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20110328

- Year of fee payment: 13

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20100323

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20100315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CONTRIBSYSTEMS VERTRIEBS GMBH

- Free text: CONTRIBSYSTEMS VERTRIEBS GMBH#DR. RUDOLF KLAFSKY STRASSE 15#2500 BADEN/WIEN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- CONTRIBSYSTEMS VERTRIEBS GMBH#DR. RUDOLF KLAFSKY STRASSE 15#2500 BADEN/WIEN (AT)

2007-03-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

2006-11-17 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-05-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CONTRIBSYSTEMS VERTRIEBS GMBH

- Effective date: 20060206

2006-04-28 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CONTRIBSYSTEMS VERTRIEBS GMBH

- Free text: ORTNER, WOLFGANG#LUSTKANDLSTRASSE 2#3061 OLLERSBACH (AT) -TRANSFER TO- CONTRIBSYSTEMS VERTRIEBS GMBH#DR. RUDOLF KLAFSKY STRASSE 15#2500 BADEN/WIEN (AT)

2005-03-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196786 T3

2003-09-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-09-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-09 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030402541

2003-08-12 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905645 P 20030626

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010621

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000930

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI NL PT SE