Global Patent Index - EP 1064452 A1

EP 1064452 A1 2001-01-03 - FORMATION TESTING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (en)

FORMATION TESTING APPARATUS AND METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM FORMATIONSTESTEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR TESTER UNE FORMATION

Publication

EP 1064452 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99909756 A

Priority

  • US 9904596 W
  • US 7714498 P
  • US 8820898 A
  • US 22686599 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9945236A1] An apparatus and method for obtaining samples of pristine formation or formation fluid, using a work string designed for performing other downhole work such as drilling, workover operations, or re-entry operations. An extendible element extends against the formation wall to obtain the pristine formation or fluid sample. While the test tool is in a standby condition, the extendible element is withdrawn within the work string, protected by other structure from damage during operation of the work string. The apparatus is used to sense or sample downhole conditions while using a work string, and the measurements or samples taken can be used to adjust working fluid properties without withdrawing the work string from the bore hole. When the extendible element is a packer, the apparatus can be used to prevent a kick from reaching the surface, adjust the density of the drilling fluid, and thereafter continuing use of the work string. The test apparatus can be mounted on a sliding, non-rotating, sleeve on the work string.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 49/10; E21B 33/124; E21B 43/26; E21B 49/00; E21B 49/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/124 (2006.01); E21B 43/26 (2006.01); E21B 49/00 (2006.01); E21B 49/06 (2006.01); E21B 49/10 (2006.01); E21B 41/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 33/1243 (2013.01); E21B 43/26 (2013.01); E21B 49/008 (2013.01); E21B 49/06 (2013.01); E21B 49/10 (2013.01); E21B 2041/0028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9945236A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9945236 A1 19990910; AU 2889299 A 19990920; DE 69928780 D1 20060112; DE 69928780 T2 20060817; EP 1064452 A1 20010103; EP 1064452 B1 20051207; NO 20004426 A 20001101; NO 20004426 D0 20000905; NO 320901 B1 20060213

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160303

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160303

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-12-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69928780

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140417

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140308

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-11-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060908

2006-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69928780 P 20060112

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2005-12-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020718

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001005

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL