Global Patent Index - EP 1064456 A1

EP 1064456 A1 2001-01-03 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MAINLY IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MAINLY IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE, NOTAMMENT D'UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE

Publication

EP 1064456 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99960871 A

Priority

  • DE 9903564 W
  • DE 19853823 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19853823A1] The method involves feeding fuel from a fuel pump (3) to a pressure reservoir (9), whereby the pump delivery rate can be varied and the fuel fed to the reservoir is adjusted to a required rate by influencing the pump delivery rate. The fuel pump delivery rate is controlled depending on a number of input parameters, i.e. the quantity of fuel to be injected and/or the engine speed and/or the induced air temp. and/or the battery voltage, via a characteristic field. An Independent claim is also included for an internal combustion engine, especially for a motor vehicle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/24 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/38 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/08 (2006.01); F02M 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/3854 (2013.01); F02D 41/2464 (2013.01); F02D 41/3082 (2013.01); F02D 41/062 (2013.01); F02D 41/2441 (2013.01); F02D 41/3809 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0031398A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19853823 A1 20000525; EP 1064456 A1 20010103; EP 1064456 B1 20050302; JP 2002530588 A 20020917; US 6367454 B1 20020409; WO 0031398 A1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-09-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59911700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130601

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071109

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061130

2007-08-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070731

2007-07-24 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2006-11-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061130

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-11-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061110

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20051205

2006-02-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-11-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051122

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051118

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-06-21 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59911700

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-04-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2003-07-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030616

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001204

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE