Global Patent Index - EP 1064498 A1

EP 1064498 A1 2001-01-03 - BURNER AND METHOD FOR REDUCING COMBUSTION HUMMING DURING OPERATION

Title (en)

BURNER AND METHOD FOR REDUCING COMBUSTION HUMMING DURING OPERATION

Title (de)

BRENNER UND VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG VON VERBRENNUNGSSCHWINGUNGEN BEIM BETRIEB

Title (fr)

BRULEUR ET PROCEDE POUR REDUIRE LES VIBRATIONS EN COURS DE COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1064498 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917770 A

Priority

  • DE 9900614 W
  • DE 19812322 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949264A1] The invention relates to a burner (1) in which a flow (7) of combustion air (5) or a combustion air/fuel mixture (5) is conveyed to a combustion process. A swirl is applied to the flow (7), this swirl being uneven in a circumferential direction. A flow channel in which a swirl device (6) for applying said swirl to the flow (7) is arranged is used to convey the combustion air (5) or combustion air/fuel mixture (5). The invention also relates to a use of a burner and to a method for reducing combustion humming.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00; F23D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/74 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23D 14/24 (2006.01); F23D 23/00 (2006.01); F23L 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/004 (2013.01); F23D 23/00 (2013.01); F23D 2206/10 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949264A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949264 A1 19990930; EP 1064498 A1 20010103; EP 1064498 B1 20021113; JP 2002507717 A 20020312; US 6374593 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070308

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070308

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070308

2006-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-03-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050303

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903398

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-19

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BURNER FOR A GAS TURBINE

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI