Global Patent Index - EP 1064498 B1

EP 1064498 B1 2002-11-13 - BURNER FOR A GAS TURBINE

Title (en)

BURNER FOR A GAS TURBINE

Title (de)

GASTURBINENBRENNER

Title (fr)

BRULEUR POUR UNE TURBINE A GAS

Publication

EP 1064498 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917770 A

Priority

  • DE 9900614 W
  • DE 19812322 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949264A1] The invention relates to a burner (1) in which a flow (7) of combustion air (5) or a combustion air/fuel mixture (5) is conveyed to a combustion process. A swirl is applied to the flow (7), this swirl being uneven in a circumferential direction. A flow channel in which a swirl device (6) for applying said swirl to the flow (7) is arranged is used to convey the combustion air (5) or combustion air/fuel mixture (5). The invention also relates to a use of a burner and to a method for reducing combustion humming.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23C 7/00; F23D 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/74 (2006.01); F23C 7/00 (2006.01); F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23D 14/24 (2006.01); F23D 23/00 (2006.01); F23L 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 7/004 (2013.01); F23D 23/00 (2013.01); F23D 2206/10 (2013.01); F23D 2210/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949264 A1 19990930; EP 1064498 A1 20010103; EP 1064498 B1 20021113; JP 2002507717 A 20020312; US 6374593 B1 20020423

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070308

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070308

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2008-01-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071130

2007-11-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070308

2006-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-24 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-20 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903398 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-04-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BURNER FOR A GAS TURBINE

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010521

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000904

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI