Global Patent Index - EP 1064510 B1

EP 1064510 B1 2002-11-13 - WALL SEGMENT FOR A COMBUSTION CHAMBER AND COMBUSTION CHAMBER

Title (en)

WALL SEGMENT FOR A COMBUSTION CHAMBER AND COMBUSTION CHAMBER

Title (de)

WANDSEGMENT FÜR EINEN BRENNRAUM SOWIE BRENNRAUM

Title (fr)

SEGMENT DE PAROI POUR UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION, ET CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION

Publication

EP 1064510 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916770 A

Priority

  • DE 9900542 W
  • DE 19812074 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947874A1] The invention relates to a wall segment (1) for a combustion chamber (2) which can be impinged upon by a hot fluid (A). The wall segment (1) has a metal support structure (3) and a heat protection element (9) secured thereon. The metal support structure (3) is provided, at least partially, with a thin and/or metal, heat resistant separating layer (7). The separating layer (7) is arranged between the metal support structure (3) and the heat protection element (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 7/28; F27D 1/04; F27D 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/42 (2006.01); F23M 5/00 (2006.01); F23M 5/04 (2006.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F27D 1/00 (2006.01); F27D 1/04 (2006.01); F27D 1/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27D 1/004 (2013.01); F23M 5/04 (2013.01); F23R 3/002 (2013.01); F27D 1/145 (2013.01); F27D 2001/047 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947874 A1 19990923; EP 1064510 A1 20010103; EP 1064510 B1 20021113; JP 2002506963 A 20020305; JP 4172913 B2 20081029; US 2002050237 A1 20020502; US 6397765 B1 20020604; US 6612248 B2 20030902

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2017-01-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2017-01-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903399

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150513

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-07-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20150602

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150312

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150328

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-20 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 59903399

2011-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903399

2011-10-01 [REG DE R409] INTERNAL RECTIFICATION OF THE LEGAL STATUS COMPLETED

- Document: DE 59903399

2009-03-31 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG;INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY FREILAGERSTRASSE 40;8047 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-06-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903399 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-10-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000828

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI