Global patent index - EP 1064539 A1

EP 1064539 A1 2001-01-03 - HEATED ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL

Title (en)

HEATED ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL

Title (de)

BEHEIZTE ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLE

Title (fr)

CELLULE ELECTROCHIMIQUE CHAUFFEE

Publication

EP 1064539 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910001 A

Priority

  • AU 9900152 W
  • AU PP238898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9946585A1] The invention provides a method for determining the concentration of an analyte in a sample comprising the steps of heating the sample and measuring the concentration of the analyte or the concentration of a species representative thereof in the sample at a predetermined point on a reaction profile by means that are substantially independent of temperature. Also provided is an electrochemical cell comprising a spacer (3) pierced by an aperture which defines a cell wall, a first metal electrode (2) on one side of the spacer extending over one side of the aperture, a second metal electrode (4) on the other side of the spacer extending over the side of the aperture opposite the first electrode, means for admitting a sample to the cell volume defined between the electrodes and the cell wall, and means for heating a sample contained within the cell (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/26; G01N 27/403

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/28 (2006.01); G01N 27/327 (2006.01); G01N 27/403 (2006.01); G01N 27/416 (2006.01); G01N 33/487 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/3274 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9946585 A1 19990916; AU PP238898 D0 19980409; CA 2322757 A1 19990916; EP 1064539 A1 20010103; EP 1064539 A4 20060802; JP 2002506969 A 20020305; TW I240071 B 20050921

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-17 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1032997

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2008-08-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080220

2007-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071009

2006-08-02 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20060705

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001012

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL