Global Patent Index - EP 1064541 A1

EP 1064541 A1 2001-01-03 - SENSOR FOR ANALYZING GASES

Title (en)

SENSOR FOR ANALYZING GASES

Title (de)

SENSOR ZUR ANALYSE VON GASEN

Title (fr)

DETECTEUR POUR L'ANALYSE DE GAZ

Publication

EP 1064541 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00907434 A

Priority

  • DE 0000135 W
  • DE 19901957 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19901957A1] The invention relates to a sensor for analyzing gas components and/or gas concentrations in gas mixtures which is especially suitable for analyzing HC, NOX and CO in the exhaust gases of internal combustion engines. According to the inventive sensor, an external electrode (16) is mounted on a substrate (10). Said external electrode is separated from an MOX electrode (20) by way of an electrolyte layer (19). The external electrode (16) and the MOX electrode (20) are in contact with the gas mixture to be analyzed. The external electrode (16) is further at least partially in contact with a gas-permeable tunnel layer (23) that is partially directly exposed to the gas mixture to be analyzed so that the gas to be analyzed can be supplied to the external electrode (16) via the gas-permeable tunnel layer (23).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 27/419

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/41 (2006.01); G01N 27/416 (2006.01); G01N 27/419 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/419 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0043767A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19901957 A1 20000810; DE 19901957 C2 20030417; EP 1064541 A1 20010103; JP 2002535650 A 20021022; US 6544394 B1 20030408; WO 0043767 A1 20000727

INPADOC legal status


2007-09-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070404

2006-12-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061123

2004-05-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE