Global Patent Index - EP 1064579 A1

EP 1064579 A1 2001-01-03 - CONFOCAL MICROSCOPY IMAGING SYSTEM

Title (en)

CONFOCAL MICROSCOPY IMAGING SYSTEM

Title (de)

KONFOKALES MIKROSKOPABBILDUNGSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

SYSTEME D'IMAGERIE CONFOCAL POUR MICROSCOPIE

Publication

EP 1064579 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914908 A

Priority

  • US 9905589 W
  • US 4252798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947963A1] A confocal imaging system utilizing an elongated beam. Specific embodiments are directed to the apparatus with charged couple devices (CCD) and those in which the apparatus is used in fluorescent object observation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/64 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/50 (2006.01); G02B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 21/0084 (2013.01); G02B 21/0028 (2013.01); G02B 21/006 (2013.01); G02B 21/0064 (2013.01); G02B 21/0072 (2013.01); G02B 21/0076 (2013.01); G01N 21/6458 (2013.01); G01N 2021/6439 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9947963 A1 19990923; WO 9947963 A8 19991118; WO 9947963 A9 19991223; AU 3354799 A 19991011; AU 758571 B2 20030327; BR 9908767 A 20011016; BR 9908767 B1 20110906; CA 2324262 A1 19990923; CA 2324262 C 20100525; CN 100380160 C 20080409; CN 1301357 A 20010627; EP 1064579 A1 20010103; EP 1064579 A4 20071107; IL 138496 D0 20011031; IL 164319 D0 20051218; JP 2002507762 A 20020312; JP 4812937 B2 20111109; KR 100618502 B1 20060901; KR 20050088500 A 20050906; NO 20004601 A 20001110; NO 20004601 D0 20000915

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140805

2011-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GE HEALTHCARE BIO-SCIENCES CORP.

2011-03-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMERSHAM BIOSCIENCES CORP.

2008-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TRAUTMAN, JAY, K.

2008-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARRIS, TIMOTHY, D.

2008-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HANSEN, RICHARD, L.

2008-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KARSH, WILLIAM

2008-12-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NICKLAUS, NEAL, A.

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: PLESS, THOMASC/O GE HEALTHCARE

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIMON, JILLC/O GE HEALTHCARE

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TRAUTMAN, JAY, K.

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARRIS, TIMOTHY, D.

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HANSEN, RICHARD, L.

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KARSH, WILLIAM

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NICKLAUS, NEAL, A.

2008-11-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GALIN, MARKUSC/O GE HEALTHCARE

2008-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080605

2007-11-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20071010

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000916

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE