Global Patent Index - EP 1064580 A1

EP 1064580 A1 2001-01-03 - TARGET ILLUMINATION DEVICE

Title (en)

TARGET ILLUMINATION DEVICE

Title (de)

ZIEL-BELEUCHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ECLAIRAGE DE CIBLE

Publication

EP 1064580 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912545 A

Priority

  • US 9905636 W
  • US 4562398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949347A1] A device for illuminating a target is provided. The target illumination device has a radiation source (20), a lens (140) and a deflector (120). The lens and the deflector are disposed in spaced apart relationship defining a transmission space (106) therebetween and a reflection space (136) proximate the transmission space. The lens is adapted to receive incident radiation from the radiation source and to transmit at least a portion of the incident radiation in a first direction through the transmission space in a manner such that the transmitted radiation is substantially uniform through the transmission space and such that the reflection space is substantially devoid of transmitted radiation. The deflector is adapted to be placed proximate a target (50) for deflecting at least a portion of the transmitted radiation onto the target at an angle such that the target reflects at least a portion of the deflected radiation in a second direction through the reflection space.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 21/00; G02B 21/06; G02B 21/08; G02B 21/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 21/06 (2006.01); G02B 21/00 (2006.01); G02B 21/08 (2006.01); G02B 21/36 (2006.01); G06K 7/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 21/08 (2013.01); G02B 21/082 (2013.01); G02B 21/084 (2013.01); G06K 7/10732 (2013.01); G06K 7/10742 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949347 A1 19990930; AU 3090199 A 19991018; CA 2324626 A1 19990930; EP 1064580 A1 20010103; EP 1064580 A4 20050427; JP 2002507779 A 20020312; MX PA00009228 A 20041203; NO 20004706 A 20001027; NO 20004706 D0 20000920

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MICROSCAN SYSTEMS, INC.

2010-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2008-04-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20080401

2005-04-27 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050311

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02B 21/00 A

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02B 21/06 B

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02B 21/36 B

2005-04-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 02B 21/08 B

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB