Global patent index - EP 1064607 A1

EP 1064607 A1 2001-01-03 - METHOD FOR GENERATING A FILE IDENTIFIER BY PERFORMING A HASH FUNCTION ON THE CONTENT OF A FILE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR GENERATING A FILE IDENTIFIER BY PERFORMING A HASH FUNCTION ON THE CONTENT OF A FILE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ERZEUGEN EINES DATEIBEZEICHNERS DURCH ANWENDUNG EINER HASHFUNKTION AUF DEN INHALT DER DATEI

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN DESIGNATEUR DE FICHIER A L'AIDE D'UNE FONCTION D'ADRESSAGE DISPERSE SUR LE CONTENU DU FICHIER

Publication

EP 1064607 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99966975 A

Priority

  • DE 19860803 A
  • EP 9910089 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19860803A1] The invention relates to a method for generating a file identifier for a file to be written into the memory of a processor integrated circuit. According to the invention, at least one part (15) of the file identifier (13) is generated by performing an unequivocal mathematical operation on a predetermined quantity of the code characters (16) of the data code contained in the file (12). Said operation generates a code sequence (23) of a predetermined number of characters for said quantity of code characters. Preferably, the file identifier additionally comprises one part (14) which contains information on the content of the file.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0041097A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19860803 A1 20000706; AU 2284200 A 20000724; EP 1064607 A1 20010103; WO 0041097 A1 20000713

INPADOC legal status

2006-04-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051005

2005-07-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050524

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010115

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE