Global Patent Index - EP 1064610 A1

EP 1064610 A1 2001-01-03 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC PAYMENT OF AT LEAST ONE ARTICLE PICKED BY A CONSUMER IN A SELF-SERVICE RESTAURANT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR AUTOMATIC PAYMENT OF AT LEAST ONE ARTICLE PICKED BY A CONSUMER IN A SELF-SERVICE RESTAURANT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND ANORDNUNG ZUR AUTOMATISCHEN BEZAHLUNG VON MINDESTENS EINEM GEGENSTAND DURCH EINEM KUNDEN IN EINEM SELBSTBEDIENUNGSRESTAURANT

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LE PAIEMENT AUTOMATIQUE D'AU MOINS UN ARTICLE PRIS PAR UN CONSOMMATEUR DANS UN RESTAURANT SELF-SERVICE

Publication

EP 1064610 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909031 A

Priority

  • FR 9900616 W
  • FR 9803407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776402A1] Each consumer is issued with a transponder module having a memory and means of consumer identification. Written to memory is consumer relevant information such as account balance, and for each product in the restaurant an identification code and a value. A pay point has a reader capable of identifying the consumer and any products selected. The module is then updated appropriately.- DETAILED DESCRIPTION - The card is updated by determining which products have been picked and subtracting the appropriate value for the product from the consumer's account balance held in memory

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60; G06K 7/10; G07F 7/08; G07G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07G 1/0036 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948034A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776402 A1 19990924; FR 2776402 B1 20021025; AU 2842399 A 19991011; DE 69913326 D1 20040115; DE 69913326 T2 20041021; EP 1064610 A1 20010103; EP 1064610 B1 20031203; WO 9948034 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130402

2013-12-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20131129

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120418

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *IER

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-03-17 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050317

2004-11-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040906

2004-10-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-05-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040521

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-06 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040506

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-05-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: IER

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2004-04-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040316

2004-03-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040325

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-01-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69913326

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-12-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2003-12-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010629

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001002

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT