Global Patent Index - EP 1064622 A1

EP 1064622 A1 2001-01-03 - TAMPER RESISTANT POSTAL SECURITY DEVICE WITH LONG BATTERY LIFE

Title (en)

TAMPER RESISTANT POSTAL SECURITY DEVICE WITH LONG BATTERY LIFE

Title (de)

BETRUGSSICHERE FRANKIERMASCHINENVORRICHTUNG MIT LANGER NUTZUNGSDAUER DER BATTERIE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SECURITE ANTI-FRAUDE POUR AFFRANCHISSEUSE

Publication

EP 1064622 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99912648 A

Priority

  • US 9905891 W
  • US 7848998 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948055A1] In accordance with the invention, a postal security device (PSD) (10) contains a non-volatile memory (13) which does not depend on battery power such as an EEPROM (13), and contains a nonvolatile memory (14, 16) which does depend on battery power, such as a static RAM. The PSD (10) also contains an encryption engine (12, 14, 22). An encryption key is developed and is stored in the static RAM (14), which is sized to be only large enough to contain the encryption key. A large body of data, too large to fit in the static RAM, is encrypted by means of the encryption engine (12, 14, 22) and with reference to the encryption key, and is stored in the EEPROM (13). This body of data typically includes cryptographic keys and sensitive bit-images. When the PSD is powered, a large RAM (typically a dynamic RAM) (16) is available to receive the large body of data, decrypted using the encryption key. A tamper switch (17) cuts power to both RAMs (14, 16) in the event of tampering.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 17/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 5/30 (2006.01); G06F 12/14 (2006.01); G06F 21/06 (2006.01); G06F 21/24 (2006.01); G07B 17/00 (2006.01); H04L 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 17/00733 (2013.01); G07B 17/00193 (2013.01); G07B 17/00362 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00233 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00258 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00346 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00395 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00403 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00862 (2013.01); G07B 2017/00967 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948055 A1 19990923; AT 300069 T 20050815; CA 2324100 A1 19990923; CA 2324100 C 20090804; DE 69926222 D1 20050825; DE 69926222 T2 20060524; EP 1064622 A1 20010103; EP 1064622 A4 20010718; EP 1064622 B1 20050720; JP 2002507802 A 20020312

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NEOPOST TECHNOLOGIES S.A., FR

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ASCOM HASLER MAILING SYSTEMS, INC., SHELTON, CONN., US

- Document: DE 69926222

2016-09-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69926222

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69926222

- Representative's name: CBDL PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2009-06-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-06-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060421

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-20 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051020

2005-08-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69926222 P 20050825

2005-07-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-07-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

2005-07-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-07-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-07-20 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-07-20 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-07-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2005-07-20 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050720

2001-07-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-07-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI

2001-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 07B 17/00 A

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI