Global Patent Index - EP 1064629 A1

EP 1064629 A1 2001-01-03 - CONTROL CIRCUIT FOR AN ALARM TONE GENERATOR

Title (en)

CONTROL CIRCUIT FOR AN ALARM TONE GENERATOR

Title (de)

EINE TREIBERSCHALTUNG FÜR EINEN ALARMTONGEBER

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE POUR GENERATEUR DE SIGNAL D'ALARME ACOUSTIQUE

Publication

EP 1064629 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919107 A

Priority

  • AU 5953798 A
  • DE 9900803 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949433A1] The present invention relates to a control circuit (2) which is intended for controlling an alarm tone generator (24) and comprises the following units: a signal generator (6, 11) for emitting a first signal; a converter (8, 10) for converting the first signal into a second signal for the alarm tone generator ; a battery (4) for the power supply of the control circuit; and a voltage raising circuit (30, 32) for increasing the voltage supply of the generator.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 3/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949433A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949433 A1 19990930; AU 5953798 A 19981203; AU 718281 B2 20000413; DE 59911098 D1 20041223; EP 1064629 A1 20010103; EP 1064629 B1 20041117; US 6603392 B1 20030805

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160525

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090323

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090322

2009-11-17 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-11-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-11-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050818

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-02-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-12-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911098 P 20041223

2004-11-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-11-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021205

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE