Global Patent Index - EP 1064663 B1

EP 1064663 B1 2001-12-12 - GAS-INSULATED LOAD-BREAK SWITCH WITH A QUENCHING COIL

Title (en)

GAS-INSULATED LOAD-BREAK SWITCH WITH A QUENCHING COIL

Title (de)

GASISOLIERTER LASTTRENNSCHALTER MIT EINER LÖSCHSPULE

Title (fr)

SECTIONNEUR SOUS CHARGE ISOLE DE GAZ AVEC UNE BOBINE DE SOUFFLAGE

Publication

EP 1064663 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910366 A

Priority

  • DE 19813217 A
  • EP 9901828 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949488A1] The invention relates to a blow-out coil for gas-insulated load-break switches whose phases have one fixed and one mobile contact, comprising a winding body supporting a single- or multi-layer winding connected to a fixed contact potential, and a field-control electrode. According to the invention the blow-out coil is configured in such a way that it can be used at lower cost and almost universally in load-break switches or switches requiring a load switching capacity. To this end the turn (9; 24) of the winding (6; 19) facing the contacts (2/4; 2a/4a; 15/25) is uninsulated, the end section (10; 23) of said turn (9; 24) is pointed towards the fixed-contact-side base of the electric arc and the free end of the end section (10; 23) is positioned at a minimum distance to said base and to the mobile contact (4; 4a; 25) which can be moved past said end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/44 (2006.01); H01H 33/18 (2006.01)

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

H01H (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/187 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949488 A1 19990930; AT 210886 T 20011215; BR 9908370 A 20001121; CN 1120511 C 20030903; CN 1274468 A 20001122; CZ 20000918 A3 20000712; CZ 296224 B6 20060215; DE 19813217 C1 19991125; EP 1064663 A1 20010103; EP 1064663 B1 20011212; ES 2168857 T3 20020616; NO 20000646 A 20000926; NO 20000646 D0 20000209; NO 317375 B1 20041018; PL 191260 B1 20060428; PL 341863 A1 20010507

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170327

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160319

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160319

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160319

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-07-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2006-04-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2006-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-03-19 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060319

2005-03-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050311

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050310

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2168857 T3

2002-05-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020315

2002-02-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900543 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE

2001-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 210886 T 20011215

2001-08-01 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GAS-INSULATED LOAD-BREAK SWITCH WITH A QUENCHING COIL

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: GAS-INSULATED LOAD-BREAK SWITCH COMPRISING A BLOW-OUT COIL

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991224

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI SE