Global Patent Index - EP 1064702 A1

EP 1064702 A1 2001-01-03 - DECOUPLED BNC CONNECTOR

Title (en)

DECOUPLED BNC CONNECTOR

Title (de)

ENTKOPPELTER BNC-VERBINDER

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR BNC DECOUPLE

Publication

EP 1064702 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 96938684 A

Priority

  • US 9617438 W
  • US 787395 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9720368A1] A board mountable BNC type electrical connector (10) is provided which offers enhanced performance, through direct grounding of the connector to the board and a spark gap feature that protects the connector against exposure to elevated voltages. A grounding clip (76) includes a board locking feature (84), a spark gap tab (92) that seats (72) within the connector housing (12), and a pair of flexible arms (82) arranged to compressively hold a pair of capacitive elements (68) within the connector (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/00; H01R 9/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/646 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/52 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9720368A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9720368 A1 19970605; AU 7600096 A 19970619; DE 69634805 D1 20050707; DE 69634805 T2 20060427; EP 1064702 A1 20010103; EP 1064702 B1 20050601; TW 359910 B 19990601

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121031

2013-08-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69634805

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130501

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121028

2013-07-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130628

2013-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20121028

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111028

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101025

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-05-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060302

2006-04-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-07-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69634805

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-07-07

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2005-06-01 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 24/00 A

2005-06-01 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 9/05 B

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980904

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB