Global Patent Index - EP 1064704 A1

EP 1064704 A1 2001-01-03 - MULTIPLE PLUG FOR DIFFERENT CONNECTION SYSTEMS

Title (en)

MULTIPLE PLUG FOR DIFFERENT CONNECTION SYSTEMS

Title (de)

MEHRFACHSTECKER FÜR UNTERSCHIEDLICHE VERBINDUNGSSYSTEME

Title (fr)

PRISE MULTIPLE POUR SYSTEMES DE CONNEXION DIFFERENTS

Publication

EP 1064704 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917820 A

Priority

  • DE 19811465 A
  • DE 19835161 A
  • DE 29816948 U
  • DE 29903331 U
  • EP 9901731 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6520787B1] The invention relates to a multi-pole multiple plug for connecting (small) electric appliances to a selection of different mains connection systems. The plug has internationally standardized pin arrangements (2) an the four sides of its housing (1) and an the base of the housing (1) is fitted with a recess for adjustably housing a contact tube (4-7) situated at the free end of a connecting cable (3) so that the strands of the connecting cable (4-7) can be connected inside the housing (1) With the pin arrangement (2) required at any particular time.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 27/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 27/00 (2006.01); H01R 31/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 27/00 (2013.01); H01R 31/06 (2013.01); H01R 13/652 (2013.01); H01R 13/70 (2013.01); H01R 24/30 (2013.01); H01R 2103/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948174A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

US 6520787 B1 20030218; AT 233441 T 20030315; AU 3596899 A 19991011; DE 19980450 D2 20010802; EP 1064704 A1 20010103; EP 1064704 B1 20030226; ES 2192044 T3 20030916; JP 2002507828 A 20020312; WO 9948174 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090317

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090317

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080317

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080318

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080318

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080314

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080320

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2192044 T3

2003-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-06-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: KELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG

2003-03-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030317

2003-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-02-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL

2003-02-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-02-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030226

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010117

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000821

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FR GB IT LI NL