Global Patent Index - EP 1064789 A1

EP 1064789 A1 2001-01-03 - DATA INTEGRATION AND REGISTRATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NON-DESTRUCTIVE EVALUATION OF MATERIALS

Title (en)

DATA INTEGRATION AND REGISTRATION METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR NON-DESTRUCTIVE EVALUATION OF MATERIALS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR INTEGRATION UND AUFZEICHNUNG UND GERÄT FÜR DIE ZERSTÖRUNGSFREIE AUSWERTUNG VON METERIALEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'INTEGRATION ET D'ENREGISTREMENT DE DONNEES POUR UNE EVALUATION NON DESTRUCTIVE DE SUBSTANCES

Publication

EP 1064789 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911002 A

Priority

  • US 9904206 W
  • US 7592098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9944366A1] A method and apparatus for non-destructive testing and evaluation of part samples include obtaining a defect image of the sample (202), displaying the defect image on a display (204), referencing the defect image (206), such as through marking or annotation, to highlight locations at which defects or measurements are found, superimposing the defect image onto a live image of the part (208), and physically marking/annotating the part, tracing the marks from the defect image onto the physical sample, while viewing the live image (210). The method is particularly useful for detecting subsurface defects in a sample via thermographic techniques.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 21/88 (2006.01); G01N 25/72 (2006.01); G06T 3/00 (2006.01); G06T 7/00 (2006.01); H04N 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/181 (2013.01); G01N 25/72 (2013.01); G06T 7/0004 (2013.01); G06T 7/30 (2017.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL LT LV MK RO SI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9944366 A1 19990902; AU 2974899 A 19990915; EP 1064789 A1 20010103; EP 1064789 A4 20070523; JP 2002505436 A 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20080304

2007-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20071022

2007-05-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20070424

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THERMAL WAVE IMAGING, INC.

2007-05-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHEPARD. STEVEN M.

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000925

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000925;LT PAYMENT 20000925;LV PAYMENT 20000925;MK PAYMENT 20000925;RO PAYMENT 20000925;SI PAYMENT 20000925