Global Patent Index - EP 1064822 A1

EP 1064822 A1 2001-01-03 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A MICROPHONE SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR OPERATING A MICROPHONE SYSTEM, ESPECIALLY IN A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM BETRIEB EINER MIKROFONANORDNUNG, INSBESONDERE IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FAIRE FONCTIONNER UN SYSTEME MICROPHONE, NOTAMMENT DANS UN VEHICULE

Publication

EP 1064822 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99910231 A

Priority

  • DE 19812697 A
  • EP 9901037 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812697A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for operating a microphone system, especially in a motor vehicle, in accordance with the preamble to claims 1 and 6. To markedly improve the recording quality of the speech signal introduced into the system the invention provides for the speech sound to be detected in several different physical locations so as to track a virtual microphone location which is optimised in relation to a moving speech source. From the evaluation of variables such as operating time and/or phase and/or amplitude the individual microphone locations can be virtually weighted and the audio signals of the microphones can be added accordingly or combined in other ways.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 3/00; B60R 16/02; H04R 1/40; G10L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 11/02 (2006.01); G10L 21/00 (2006.01); H04R 1/40 (2006.01); H04R 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 3/005 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949698A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812697 A1 19990930; EP 1064822 A1 20010103; EP 1064822 B1 20020116; JP 2002508642 A 20020319; JP 4226214 B2 20090218; US 6748088 B1 20040608; WO 9949698 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160229

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-15 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59900630

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110702

2011-07-27 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59900630

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020730

2002-05-08 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900630

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2002-01-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020116

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 04R 3/00 A, 7H 04R 1/40 B, 7B 60R 16/02 B, 7G 10L 21/00 B

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010509

2001-01-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT