Global Patent Index - EP 1064862 A1

EP 1064862 A1 2001-01-03 - Improvements introduced in footwear manufacturing processes

Title (en)

Improvements introduced in footwear manufacturing processes

Title (de)

Verbesserung des Herstellungsverfahrens von Schuhwerk

Title (fr)

Améliorations apportées aux procédés de fabrication de chaussures

Publication

EP 1064862 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500252 A

Priority

ES 9901438 A

Abstract (en)

The footwear manufacturing process, according to the improvements of the invention, is based on initially producing a double insole (4) and a double sole (5), each formed by separate pieces (6 - 7) and (9 - 10), secured in the first case by means of sewing and gluing, with the lower piece (7) being antibacterial and the upper piece (6), which constitutes the insole itself, being made of a material that feels soft to the foot, while the lower piece (9) of the double sole (5) has a larger outer perimeter than the upper piece (10) which is made of an elastomer material, both pieces having cuts (13 - 14), and are secured to each other and finally both sets (4) and (5) are attached to each other, to jointly receive, by means of an outer band (12) along the perimeter of the double sole (5), the side flaps (2) of the upper itself (1), followed by the definitive securing of the outsole below (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 17/10; A43B 7/06; A43B 9/10; A43B 13/12; A43B 13/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/06 (2006.01); A43B 9/10 (2006.01); A43B 13/12 (2006.01); A43B 13/38 (2006.01); A43B 17/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/06 (2013.01); A43B 1/0045 (2013.01); A43B 9/10 (2013.01); A43B 13/12 (2013.01); A43B 13/38 (2013.01); A43B 17/10 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1064862 A1 20010103; EP 1064862 B1 20051019; DE 69927796 D1 20060302; DE 69927796 T2 20060706; ES 2182609 A1 20030301; ES 2182609 B1 20040801; ES 2321894 A1 20090612; ES 2321894 B1 20100407

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20151229

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20151230

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-12-29 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2006-09-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060720

2006-07-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-20 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060320

2006-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69927796 P 20060302

2005-10-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL PT

2005-10-19 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051019

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE FR IT NL PT

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010528

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR IT NL PT

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI