Global Patent Index - EP 1064865 A2

EP 1064865 A2 2001-01-03 - Ring attachment structure

Title (en)

Ring attachment structure

Title (de)

Fingerringbefestigungstruktur

Title (fr)

Structure de fixation pour bague

Publication

EP 1064865 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00114243 A

Priority

JP 18934199 A

Abstract (en)

A ring attachment structure for attaching a ring to an object to be adorned includes an opening formed in the object for passage of a band of a ring, a first attachment means formed with a through-hole that is fitted in an area surrounded by the band of the ring, a second attachment means formed with a hole that is fixed to the object at a location adjacent to the opening in the object, the hole being positioned to align with the through-hole of the first attachment means when the first attachment means is fitted in the area surrounded by the band of the ring and the band of the ring is passed through the opening, and a locking member that passes through the aligned through-hole and hole. The ring attachment structure facilitates use of rings in unconventional ways. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45C 13/08; A44C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45C 13/06 (2006.01); A44C 9/00 (2006.01); A44C 13/00 (2006.01); A44C 15/00 (2006.01); A44C 17/02 (2006.01); A45C 13/08 (2006.01); A45C 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 9/0084 (2013.01); A44C 15/001 (2013.01); A45C 13/08 (2013.01); A45C 15/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1064865 A2 20010103; EP 1064865 A3 20011004; JP 2001017226 A 20010123; JP 3081840 B1 20000828

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-07 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020613

2002-08-01 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-06-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020327

2001-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-10-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 45C 13/08 A, 7A 44C 9/00 B, 7A 44C 15/00 B, 7A 45C 15/00 B

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI