Global patent index - EP 1064867 A1

EP 1064867 A1 2001-01-03 - Stackable furniture and method for space savingly storing bulky objects

Title (en)

Stackable furniture and method for space savingly storing bulky objects

Title (de)

Stapelmöbel und Verfahren zum platzsparenden Aufbewahren sperriger Gegenstände

Title (fr)

Meuble superposable et procédé pour stocker des objets volumineux en réduisant l'encombrement

Publication

EP 1064867 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00111646 A

Priority

  • DE 29909591 U
  • DE 10012398 A
  • DE 10026910 A
  • DE 10028404 A

Abstract (en)

The stackable item of furniture, e.g. a table or seat, comprises a frame (2.0) consisting of legs linked by cross-bars and which has one open side. A panel (1.0) forming the table top or seat cushion can be fitted to the frame. Either the seat or panel carries a mounting system which also prevents the panel from sliding sideways. The panel can be removed and the frames stacked one inside the other, the panels being stacked separately.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Stapelmöbel vorgeschlagen, dessen Abschlußplatte (1.0) und Gestell (2.0) bei Nichtgebrauch ein platzoptimiertes Lagervolumen einnehmen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 7/02; A47B 3/12; A47C 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/12 (2006.01); A47B 7/02 (2006.01); A47B 13/00 (2006.01); A47B 13/06 (2006.01); A47C 3/04 (2006.01); A47C 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 3/12 (2013.01); A47B 7/02 (2013.01); A47B 13/003 (2013.01); A47B 13/06 (2013.01); A47C 3/045 (2013.01); A47C 4/02 (2013.01); A47C 4/03 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19642391 A1 19980416 - THONET GEB GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1064867 A1 20010103; DE 10026910 A1 20010215; DE 10028404 A1 20011220; DE 29909591 U1 19990930

INPADOC legal status

2003-09-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030226

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021015

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI