Global Patent Index - EP 1064873 A2

EP 1064873 A2 2001-01-03 - Tub support

Title (en)

Tub support

Title (de)

Wannenträger

Title (fr)

Support de cuvette

Publication

EP 1064873 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113668 A

Priority

  • DE 19930590 A
  • DE 10029461 A

Abstract (en)

Bath or shower tray support has between support frame (3) and base (4) a part-filled space is formed, accommodating locally-displaced foam. An Independent claim is included for the corresponding method of making the support and of supporting the e.g. bath or shower tray.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Wannenträger (1) aus einem Schaumstoff wie mineralischem, anorganischem, organischem Leichtschaum, insbesondere Partikelschaumstoff wie EPP, EPS, bspw. Duschwannenträger oder Badewannenträger, mit einem umlaufenden, eine Trägerwandung für eine außenseitige Verfliesung bildenden Wannenträgerrahmen (3), wobei der Wannenträgerboden (4) als Einlegeboden ausgebildet ist, unter Ausfüllen der von dem Wannenträgerrahmen (3) ausgebildeten Aufnahmeöffnung (5), und schlägt zur Erzielung einer wirtschaftlich, gebrauchsstabilen Lösung vor, daß zwischen dem Wannenträgerrahmen (3) und dem Wannenträgerboden (4) ein teilweise gefüllter Ausweichraum ausgebildet ist, in welchem verdrängter Ortschaum und/oder Vergußmasse auf genommen ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/16 (2006.01); A47K 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/40 (2013.01); A47K 3/1605 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1064873 A2 20010103; EP 1064873 A3 20020130; PL 195799 B1 20071031; PL 341131 A1 20010115; TR 200002003 A2 20010122

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI