Global patent index - EP 1064904 A2

EP 1064904 A2 2001-01-03 - Electromotive driving arrangement for furniture

Title (en)

Electromotive driving arrangement for furniture

Title (de)

Elektromotorische Antriebsanordnung für Möbel

Title (fr)

Dispositif électromoteur pour meuble

Publication

EP 1064904 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00109286 A

Priority

DE 29911320 U

Abstract (en)

The drive arrangement includes one or several drive motors, at least one operating arrangement, and a control unit, whereby determined functions triggered by the operating arrangement are lockable. The arrangement is provided with at least one switch (12) formed as a locking element, which is mounted at a position of the furniture, exclusively accessible by the care personnel.

Abstract (de)

Eine elektromotorische Antriebsanordnung für Möbel, insbesondere für Krankenhausmöbel und Möbel für den Pflegebereich, die mit einem oder mit mehreren Antriebsmotoren ausgestattet sind, die von einer Bedienungseinrichtung und einer Steuereinheit angesteuert sind, und die so ausgelegt sind, daß bestimmte Funktionen gesperrt werden können, soll so ausgestattet werden, daß beim Auftreten eines ersten Fehlers für den Patienten keine Gefahr eintritt. Die elektromotorische Antriebsanordnung ist mit wenigstens einem Schalter (12) ausgerüstet, der als Sperrelement ausgelegt ist und der an einer Stelle des Möbels montiert ist, die ausschließlich vom Pflegepersonal erreicht werden kann. Der Schalter (12) kann an geeigneter Stelle installiert werden, beispielsweise in der vom Stromversorgungsnetz kommenden Leitung, oder in der zum Motor führenden Stromzuführungsleitung. Innerhalb des Schalters (12) sind in bevorzugter Ausführung Sicherungs- und Meldeelemente installiert. Der Schalter (12) kann außerdem im Gehäuse der Steuereinheit installiert werden. Die erfindungsgemäße elektromotorische Antriebsanordnung kann besonders für Krankenhausbetten und für Betten in Pflegeheimen verwendet werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/018; A61G 7/05

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 17/86 (2006.01); A61G 7/00 (2006.01); A61G 7/018 (2006.01); H02P 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/018 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911320 U1 19990902; EP 1064904 A2 20010103; EP 1064904 A3 20020821; JP 2001037292 A 20010209

INPADOC legal status

2006-05-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051103

2003-05-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB NL

2003-04-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20030129

2002-08-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI