Global Patent Index - EP 1064968 A2

EP 1064968 A2 2001-01-03 - Evacuation tube as means of transportation

Title (en)

Evacuation tube as means of transportation

Title (de)

Evakuierungsschlauch als Transportmittel

Title (fr)

Tuyau d'évacuation comme moyen de transport

Publication

EP 1064968 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00111767 A

Priority

DE 19930350 A

Abstract (en)

An evacuation tube (1) consists of an extendable inner tube (2) linked to a non-extendable outer tube (3). A ringed area (5) between these inner and outer tubes is subdivided into ringed chambers (7-11). There are aperture valves (12) in separating walls (6) between the ringed chambers.

Abstract (de)

Ein Evakuierungsschlauch (1) als Transportmittel für Menschen, Tiere, Güter ist als flexibles Bauteil ausgebildet. Der Evakuierungsschlauch (1) besteht aus einem dehnbaren Innenschlauch (2) und einem damit verbundenen, nicht dehnbaren Außenschlauch (3). Ein Ringbereich (5) zwischen dem Innenschlauch (2) und dem Außenschlauch (3) ist in axial hintereinander liegende Ringkammern (7 bis 11) unterteilt. Zwischen den Ringkammern (7 bis 11) liegen in den trennenden Wänden (6) Schlitzventile (12). Der Bremseffekt für einen zu evakuierenden Menschen (16) beruht auf der Reibungskraft am Innenschlauch (2) und auf der Luftbremse der in den Ringkammern (7 bis 11) wechselnd komprimierten Luft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 1/20 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19917188 A1 20001026 - DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1064968 A2 20010103; EP 1064968 A3 20010404; EP 1064968 B1 20060830; DE 19930350 A1 20010111; DE 19930350 B4 20040826; DE 50013374 D1 20061012; NO 20003127 A 20010102; NO 20003127 D0 20000616; NO 320513 B1 20051212

INPADOC legal status


2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070511

2007-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070531

2007-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-03-28 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-12-11 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50013374 P 20061012

2006-08-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2006-08-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-08-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2006-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060830

2005-03-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DIEHL BGT DEFENCE GMBH & CO.KG

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010426

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI