Global Patent Index - EP 1065006 A1

EP 1065006 A1 2001-01-03 - Device for injecting mortar in a drilled hole

Title (en)

Device for injecting mortar in a drilled hole

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Injizieren von Mörtel in ein Bohrloch

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour injecter du mortier dans un trou foré

Publication

EP 1065006 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00112355 A

Priority

DE 29911429 U

Abstract (en)

The mortar flows through a tube (12) whose external diameter is considerably less than the internal diameter of the blind bore (24) in the solid masonry (26). A grommet (20) fits on the end of the tube and has a radial flange (22) whose external diameter is only very slightly less than the internal diameter of the bore, forming a piston. As the mortar flows through the tube into the space (28) between the flange and the closed end of the bore. The piston and tube are pushed back toward the mouth of the bore.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Vorrichtung (10) zum Injiizieren von Mörtel (28) in ein Bohrloch (24) mit Hilfe eines Injektionsrohres (12). Um ein blasenfreies Injiizieren des Mörtels (28) in das Bohrloch (24) zu ermöglichen weist das Injektionsrohr (12) einen seitlich abstehenden Bund (22) auf. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05C 17/005; B05C 7/00; E21D 20/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05C 7/00 (2006.01); B05C 17/005 (2006.01); E21D 20/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05C 17/00503 (2013.01); B05C 7/00 (2013.01); E21D 20/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29911429 U1 20001123; EP 1065006 A1 20010103

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020222

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011011

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001124

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI