Global patent index - EP 1065009 A1

EP 1065009 A1 2001-01-03 - Apparatus and method for generating and radiating ultrasound

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for generating and radiating ultrasound

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Erzeugung und Abstrahlung von Ultraschallenergie

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la génération et la propagation d'énergie ultrasonique

Publication

EP 1065009 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810566 A

Priority

EP 99810566 A

Abstract (en)

The device has at least one transducer (2) in a cylindrical resonator (3), whose upper surface (5) contacts the liquid. At least one end of the resonator is fixed at the position of longitudinal wave maximum at one end face of the transducer. The total length (L) of the resonator is equal to a whole number of half wavelengths ( lambda /2) of the longitudinal noise waves produced from the transducer and forming standing waves in the resonator. An Independent claim is included for a method for using the device.

Abstract (de)

In einer Vorrichtung (1) und einem Verfahren zur Erzeugung und Abstrahlung von Ultraschallenergie in Flüssigkeiten mit oder ohne Feststoffanteilen insbesondere zur Beschallung von Reinigungsbädern, wird mittels eines rohrförmigen Körpers (3), der auf ein ganzzahliges Vielfaches der akustischen Länge (/2) der Betriebsfrequenz zur Erzeugung von Querkontraktionen an deren Dehnungsknoten abgestimmt ist Schwingenergie in die Flüssigkeit eingeleitet. Aussen- und Innendurchmesser des Körpers (3) werden so gewählt, dass die Oberfläche (5) des Körpers maximiert ist und dass die longitudinale Resonanzfrequenz trotzdem unterhalb der radialen Resonanzfrequenz liegt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B06B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B06B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B06B 3/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065009 A1 20010103

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021228

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020816

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010507

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI