Global Patent Index - EP 1065033 A2

EP 1065033 A2 2001-01-03 - Process and device for preparing a binder , in particular a dry or pulverulent binding building material

Title (en)

Process and device for preparing a binder , in particular a dry or pulverulent binding building material

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Anmachen von abbindendem Material, insbesondere von einer trockenen oder rieselfähigen Baustoffmischung

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la préparation de matériaux liants , en particulier d'un mélange pour matériau de construction sec ou pulvérulent

Publication

EP 1065033 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113445 A

Priority

DE 19930554 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves using a dosing device to supply pourable material to a mixing area (9) of a mixing chamber (5), where it is mixed with fluid before supply from a pump (11). The dosing device and a mixing device (7) in the mixing chamber are separately operated. The pourable material is supplied perpendicular to the feed device in the mixing chamber in a front or transfer area of the mixing chamber in front of the mixing area. At least part of the mixing fluid is supplied to the front area to form a sump area (16). The dosed dry material is fed or scattered in the sump area. The front area, sump area or edge area (17) between the sump area and the mixing area is monitored using a probe (15), a sensor or a filling level measuring device (15a), to control the supply of the dosed material or the fluid, so that when the pumped feed quantity, and with it the quantity of material in the monitored area, is reduced or increased, the supply of dosed materials or fluid is reduced or stopped or increased, as appropriate. An Independent claim is included for a device for implementing the method.

Abstract (de)

Zum Anmachen von abbindendem Material, insbesondere zum Anmachen einer Baustoffmischung kann diese während einer Beförderung in einer Richtung dosiert und in einen Mischbereich 9 einer Mischkammer 5 eingebracht werden, der eine gegenüber der Förderrichtung der Dosiervorrichtung 4 andere Richtung hat, was eine gute Trennung des Dosierbereiches von dem Mischbereich 9 erlaubt. Dabei kann der Übergangsbereich, insbesondere ein durch die Anmachflüssigkeit gebildeter Einsumpfbereich 16, in welchen das dosierte Material eingebracht wird, und/oder eine Grenzschicht zwischen diesem Einsumpfbereich 16 und dem eigentlichen Mischbereich 9 mit einer oder mehreren Sonden 15 oder dergleichen Meßvorrichtungen 15a überwacht werden, so daß bei einer zu starken Abnahme der Füllung in dem Mischbereich 9 die Zufuhr des Materiales und der Anmachflüssigkeit vergrößert und bei einer zu starken Zunahme vermindert werden können. Dies ermöglicht einen kontinuierlichen Betrieb mit dennoch wechselnden Abnahmemengen an einer Förderpumpe 11 oder auch einen chargenweisen Betrieb, da sich der Füllungsgrad in der Mischkammer jeweils aufgrund der Sondensteuerung selbsttätig anpaßt beziehungsweise in vorwählbaren und vorbestimmten Grenzen aufrechterhalten läßt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28C 5/12; B28C 7/04; B28C 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28C 5/12 (2006.01); B28C 7/02 (2006.01); B28C 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 7/00708 (2013.01); B01F 7/022 (2013.01); B01F 7/04 (2013.01); B01F 15/0251 (2013.01); B01F 15/0289 (2013.01); B28C 5/12 (2013.01); B28C 5/1284 (2013.01); B28C 5/1292 (2013.01); B28C 7/02 (2013.01); B28C 5/0862 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065033 A2 20010103; EP 1065033 A3 20020102; EP 1065033 B1 20031217; AT 256542 T 20040115; DE 19930554 C1 20010607; ES 2211418 T3 20040716

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160706

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160627

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160624

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160620

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040517

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *M-TEC MATHIS TECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-12-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040920

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-28 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2211418

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-24 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040624

2004-06-16 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20031217

2004-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2004-03-17 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-03-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040317

2004-01-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50004766

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-01-29

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-01-28 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-12-17 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-17 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030402

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-04-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020118

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 28C 5/12 A, 7B 28C 7/04 B, 7B 28C 7/12 B, 7B 28C 7/02 B

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI