Global Patent Index - EP 1065053 A1

EP 1065053 A1 2001-01-03 - Processless printing plate with low ratio of anorganic pigment over hardener

Title (en)

Processless printing plate with low ratio of anorganic pigment over hardener

Title (de)

Verarbeitungsfreie Flachdruckplatte mit niedrigem anorganisches Pigment/Härter Verhältnis

Title (fr)

Plaque d'impression lithographique sans traitement avec un faible rapport pigment inorganique/durcisseur

Publication

EP 1065053 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99202112 A

Priority

EP 99202112 A

Abstract (en)

According to the present invention there is provided a heat-sensitive material for making lithographic plates comprising in the order given on a support an IR-sensitive oleophilic layer and a cross-linked hydrophilic layer comprising an anorganic pigment and a hardener, characterized in that the ratio of said anorganic pigment over the hardener is comprised between 75/25 and 25/75 by weight.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41C 1/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G03F 7/004 (2006.01); B41C 1/055 (2006.01); B41C 1/10 (2006.01); B41N 1/14 (2006.01); G03F 7/00 (2006.01); G03F 7/11 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41C 1/1016 (2013.01); B41C 1/1041 (2013.01); B41C 2210/04 (2013.01); B41C 2210/08 (2013.01); B41C 2210/14 (2013.01); B41C 2210/20 (2013.01); B41C 2210/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1065053 A1 20010103; EP 1065053 B1 20040204; DE 69914589 D1 20040311; DE 69914589 T2 20041216; JP 2001039046 A 20010213

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100629

2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100630

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110101

2011-03-18 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20100629

2009-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090420

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-12 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2007-04-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69914589

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-11

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030519

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-08-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010703

2001-01-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI